U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Henneberry
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 24, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • June 24, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 24, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • June 10, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 09, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 03, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • February 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order]
  • January 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • January 18, 2022: [Appear]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 27, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • December 23, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • December 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • December 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 06, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • December 06, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • December 06, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 06, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • December 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 06, 2021: [Arrest ]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • November 18, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • November 18, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.