U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00099-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Castillo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 27, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 27, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • July 27, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • July 18, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • July 11, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 13, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 03, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • March 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 22, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • February 22, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • February 17, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 14, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • February 14, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 14, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • February 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 06, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • November 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • November 23, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • November 23, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 19, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 18, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • November 18, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • November 18, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.