U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00100-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ereaux et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • May 08, 2025: [Vacate]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 19, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 19, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 19, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 05, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 03, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • June 24, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 23, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 23, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • June 23, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • June 09, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 01, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 24, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 23, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • May 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • April 21, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • April 11, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order]
  • March 21, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • March 09, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 04, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • March 04, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 02, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • February 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 07, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • February 07, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 04, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 04, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • January 04, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 04, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • January 04, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 03, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • December 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • December 20, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 20, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • December 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • December 20, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • December 20, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 17, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • December 17, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 17, 2021: [Arrest ]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Warrant Issued (Sealed) - MT]
  • November 18, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • November 18, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • November 18, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.