U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lipari
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 18, 2023: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 18, 2023: [Judgment - SDM]
  • January 18, 2023: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 06, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 21, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 21, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 12, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 12, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 28, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • September 28, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 27, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 27, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 01, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 23, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 18, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • August 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 16, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 28, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 28, 2022: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • June 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance on Pretrial Release Violation]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • February 03, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • December 16, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • December 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • December 15, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • December 13, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • November 19, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • November 19, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.