U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garcia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 22, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 22, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • June 22, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 19, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 19, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • May 19, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • May 19, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 08, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 08, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 07, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • April 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • April 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 30, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention - MT]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • March 29, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 29, 2022: [1 - Interpreter Used - Use Only with Other Event]
  • March 25, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • March 24, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • November 19, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • November 19, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.