U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:93-cr-00053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rivera
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Transcript - SDM]
  • April 03, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • April 01, 2025: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
November, 2024
  • November 05, 2024: [Continue ]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Continue ]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion to Compel ]
  • October 08, 2024: [Response to Motion]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Compel ]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Petition/Order Modifying Prob/SRT/COR (Form 12B) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.