U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vela
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations]
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 02, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • December 02, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • December 02, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 02, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • December 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 27, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • June 07, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 19, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • May 19, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • May 19, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 31, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • March 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 23, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 28, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • November 19, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • November 19, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.