U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00124
  • Case Name: Arias et al v. OCC-O'Connor Crops & Cattle, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 16, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • May 16, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • March 10, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • March 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • March 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 09, 2022: [Vacate]
  • March 07, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • February 25, 2022: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • February 04, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • February 03, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • February 01, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • November 19, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 19, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.