U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00078-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reed
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 08, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 08, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 08, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Letter - MT]
  • November 25, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Letter - MT]
  • October 03, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 24, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 10, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 09, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • August 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 09, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • July 28, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • July 28, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • July 28, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • July 12, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 11, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • July 11, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • July 11, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • July 11, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order]
  • July 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance on Pretrial Release Violation]
  • July 06, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing - SDM]
  • July 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order]
  • June 27, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 27, 2022: [Vacate]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 04, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 04, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 03, 2022: [Vacate]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 26, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 26, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 22, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 14, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 13, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • December 07, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • December 01, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • November 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 19, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 19, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.