U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00077
  • Case Name: Feeney v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Appear]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 09, 2023: [Telephonic Scheduling Conference]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 05, 2023: [Settlement Conference - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Order]
  • November 01, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • November 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 01, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • November 01, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 25, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 20, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • April 14, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 12, 2022: [Protective Order]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • March 10, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • February 16, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • February 15, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order]
  • February 15, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • February 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • February 08, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Status Report]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Order]
  • December 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • December 01, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • November 30, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order]
  • November 24, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • November 24, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • November 24, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.