U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Santana-Salgado
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 20, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 03, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • January 03, 2022: [Response to Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 20, 2021: [Compassionate Release]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order to Locate Counsel - MT]
  • November 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • November 23, 2021: [Compassionate Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.