U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ashley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • April 10, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • April 02, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 01, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 13, 2025: [Expedite ]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • March 03, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • March 02, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
  • February 04, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • February 03, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • February 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 31, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.