U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00116
  • Case Name: Lake v. CoreCivic, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Proposed Verdict Form - MT]
  • April 14, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions - SDM]
  • April 10, 2025: [Pretrial Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Pretrial Conference - Final - SDM]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 09, 2025: [Trial Brief]
  • April 03, 2025: [Proposed Pretrial Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 17, 2025: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • December 16, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 16, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 26, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • July 25, 2022: [Vacate]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 21, 2022: [Application for Stay of Execution]
  • March 21, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 20, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 20, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • January 19, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • January 19, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • January 19, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • January 19, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 14, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • December 01, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 01, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • November 24, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.