U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-po-05242-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Sanchez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB)]
  • March 01, 2022: [Disposition NEF (Updates CVB) - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Quash ]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • February 17, 2022: [Add Disposition Text]
  • February 12, 2022: [Payment Received (Updates CVB) - SDM]
  • February 10, 2022: [Minute Entry - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Order]
  • December 02, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 02, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • December 01, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • November 24, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.