U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00144
  • Case Name: Center for Biological Diversity v. U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • November 23, 2022: [Settlement Agreement]
  • November 18, 2022: [Status Report]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 02, 2022: [Stay]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Status Report]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 28, 2022: [Stay]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • June 27, 2022: [Stay]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Order - MT]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • April 01, 2022: [Stay]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 08, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 08, 2022: [Intervene]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • February 04, 2022: [Stay]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • December 06, 2021: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order]
  • November 29, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • November 29, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • November 29, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • November 29, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.