U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00126
  • Case Name: McKee v. Kijakazi
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • August 09, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • June 09, 2022: [Remand]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Social Security Briefing Schedule - MT]
  • March 09, 2022: [Administrative Record]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • February 18, 2022: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • February 18, 2022: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • February 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • November 29, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • November 29, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.