U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00145
  • Case Name: Cross v. Allied Waste Services of North America, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • January 10, 2023: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 04, 2023: [Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order]
  • October 17, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • September 07, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 10, 2022: [Response to Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Order of Recusal]
  • December 23, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 22, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 22, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • December 08, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • November 29, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 29, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • November 29, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.