U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-po-05063-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Atchley
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Payment Received (Updates CVB) - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Payment Rescheduled (Updates CVB) - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB)]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • January 31, 2022: [Vacate]
  • January 31, 2022: [Plea Letter]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
  • December 02, 2021: [Terminate Hearings - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • November 30, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.