U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-po-05257-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Ye
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB)]
  • December 16, 2021: [Disposition NEF (Updates CVB) - MT]
  • December 08, 2021: [Payment Received (Updates CVB) - SDM]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • December 06, 2021: [Appear]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 02, 2021: [Vacate]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • November 30, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.