U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00117
  • Case Name: Leksen v. Walmart Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
  • June 14, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 10, 2022: [Telephonic Scheduling Conference]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 09, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 06, 2022: [Mediation - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • February 15, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 15, 2022: [Remark]
  • February 14, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • February 14, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • February 14, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • December 21, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 09, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 30, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • November 30, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.