U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00118
  • Case Name: Barnes et al v. 3 Rivers Telephone Cooperative, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • October 05, 2022: [Telephonic Status Conference]
  • October 03, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 06, 2022: [Telephonic Scheduling Conference]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Settlement Conference - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [Settlement Conference - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • May 17, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 11, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • April 11, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • April 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 29, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • March 29, 2022: [Vacate]
  • March 22, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 22, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • March 02, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • February 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • February 01, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 01, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • December 08, 2021: [Affidavit of Service]
  • December 01, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 01, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • December 01, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.