U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:13-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Schmidt
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • May 03, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • May 03, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 22, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 22, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 22, 2022: [Arrest ]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
  • December 01, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.