U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wippert
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Sealed Document]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 19, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • December 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 07, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • December 07, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 27, 2022: [Competency Hearing - SDM]
  • October 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 06, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 26, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 26, 2022: [Forensic Evaluation Report - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam - SDM]
  • June 13, 2022: [Psychiatric Exam ]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • May 06, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 06, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order]
  • February 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • February 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 14, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 21, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • December 21, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 21, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 15, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • December 15, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 10, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • December 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 01, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • December 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • December 01, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.