U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00114
  • Case Name: Gomez v Bludworth et al.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Objection to Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • April 07, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
  • April 07, 2022: [Letter]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Objection to Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • March 14, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order to Serve Complaint - MT]
  • March 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement - SDM]
  • December 29, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order]
  • December 02, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 02, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.