U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gallagher
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • June 07, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • June 07, 2022: [Jury Verdict - Redacted -MT]
  • June 07, 2022: [Jury Verdict - Unredacted - SDM]
  • June 07, 2022: [Jury Notes ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order]
  • June 07, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Witness List - SDM]
  • June 07, 2022: [Jury Instructions ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Jury Instructions ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Jury List ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • June 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 05, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • June 05, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions - SDM]
  • June 01, 2022: [Trial Brief ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order]
  • May 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 31, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • May 31, 2022: [Telephone Conference ]
  • May 31, 2022: [Proposed Verdict Form - MT]
  • May 31, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions - SDM]
  • May 31, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • May 31, 2022: [Trial Brief ]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 21, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • May 20, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • May 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 05, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 03, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • April 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 26, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 26, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • April 20, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 05, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 01, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 01, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • February 16, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
  • February 11, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • February 09, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • January 31, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 31, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 12, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 12, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • January 04, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 03, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 02, 2021: [Summons Issued (Sealed) - MT]
  • December 02, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • December 02, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • December 02, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.