U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00082-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hernandez-Fields
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 27, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • May 26, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • May 19, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 04, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 24, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 24, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • February 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • February 08, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • February 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 31, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 31, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • January 19, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • January 12, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 12, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • January 07, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • January 07, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 06, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 06, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • January 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 06, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 02, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • December 02, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • December 02, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.