U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00119
  • Case Name: Ironman-Whitecow v. Salmonsen et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • December 02, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • December 02, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 02, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.