U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00127
  • Case Name: Little Coyote et al v. Tinker et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 10, 2021: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement - SDM]
  • December 02, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • December 02, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • December 02, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.