U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CHAMP
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Letter - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [1 - Applicable Party Document-use ONLY with other selection]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 19, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 19, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 19, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • October 14, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 21, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 21, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • June 21, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 21, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • June 21, 2022: [Amended Document (NOT Motion) - MT]
  • June 09, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • June 08, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • June 08, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • February 24, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • February 24, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • February 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 24, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 11, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing - SDM]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • January 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 06, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • December 15, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • December 15, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 10, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 07, 2021: [Hearing]
  • December 07, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 07, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 03, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • December 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 02, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.