U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00057-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Zabolotney
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • August 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • July 27, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 27, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • July 27, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • July 19, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 13, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 29, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 28, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • March 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Expedite ]
  • March 22, 2022: [Expedite ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 18, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 18, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • March 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • February 21, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • February 09, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • February 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 02, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • February 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • February 02, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • February 02, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 03, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 27, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 07, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 02, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 02, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • December 02, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • December 02, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.