U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Richter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Remark - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order]
  • April 25, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 25, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 25, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 14, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
  • April 14, 2022: [Witness List - SDM]
  • April 14, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 10, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • February 10, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 25, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 17, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 14, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • January 11, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 22, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 09, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • December 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 02, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • December 02, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • December 02, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.