U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Petersen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 27, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • July 27, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • July 26, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • July 15, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 23, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 07, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 06, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 06, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 06, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • April 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • March 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 21, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 18, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • March 10, 2022: [Vacate]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order Modifying Conditions of Release - MT]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • January 19, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • January 19, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • December 02, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • December 02, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.