U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00087-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Spotted Eagle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 03, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 03, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 12, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 12, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • September 12, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • June 29, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 29, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 28, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 28, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • February 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 24, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 24, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • February 02, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • January 25, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 25, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • January 07, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 06, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 06, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • January 06, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 02, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • December 02, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • December 02, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.