U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00084-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mosmiller
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 07, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 07, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • July 07, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 18, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 18, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 13, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 11, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 11, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 11, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • February 02, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • January 19, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • January 13, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • January 12, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • January 12, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 12, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • January 03, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 02, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • December 02, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • December 02, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.