U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00083-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Schildt
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 20, 2022: [Dismiss ]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 23, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • May 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • February 22, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 22, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • January 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 19, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 06, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 03, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 02, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • December 02, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • December 02, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.