U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00146
  • Case Name: Hartman v. Knudsen et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 11, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • December 21, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 03, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 03, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.