U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00007
  • Case Name: Calumet Montana Refining v. Regan
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Stipulated Motion - MT]
  • November 01, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
  • November 01, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • October 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • October 11, 2022: [Remark]
  • October 07, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 11, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Set Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • December 06, 2021: [Stay]
  • December 06, 2021: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order]
  • December 06, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.