U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-00091
  • Case Name: Lowry v. Dutton et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 10, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Letter]
  • December 06, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • December 06, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • December 06, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.