U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00120
  • Case Name: Polejewski v. Cascade County Officials et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 05, 2022: [Remark]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • December 06, 2021: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
  • December 06, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.