U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00121
  • Case Name: Lyons v. Newton et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 23, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • November 22, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • November 22, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • November 22, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • November 03, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • November 03, 2022: [Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
  • August 30, 2022: [Appear]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 26, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • August 13, 2022: [Response to Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 28, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 28, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 12, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • May 12, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 30, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 30, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • February 25, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 22, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • February 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • February 10, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 09, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • February 01, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order]
  • February 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • January 27, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order]
  • January 13, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 12, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 12, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Clarify - MT]
  • January 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 10, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 07, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • January 06, 2022: [Lodged Sealed Document - MT]
  • January 06, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • January 06, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • January 06, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 06, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • January 06, 2022: [Errata - MT]
  • January 06, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • January 06, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 04, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 04, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 03, 2022: [Continue]
  • January 03, 2022: [Clarify - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 20, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 17, 2021: [Status Report]
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order]
  • December 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • December 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 14, 2021: [Telephonic Status Conference]
  • December 14, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
  • December 13, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 08, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 07, 2021: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • December 07, 2021: [Expedite]
  • December 07, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 07, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • December 07, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • December 07, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.