U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-00092
  • Case Name: Brown et al v. Jacobsen
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [USCA Order - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 19, 2022: [Notice of Cross Appeal - SDM]
  • August 09, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 05, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Order - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order]
  • April 05, 2022: [Costs Taxed]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 22, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 22, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • March 22, 2022: [Application for Taxation of Costs - SDM]
  • March 08, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order]
  • March 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • March 04, 2022: [Bench Trial - Held]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice of Intent to Use Electronic Evidence or Video Conferencing - MT]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order]
  • March 01, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice of Intent to Use Electronic Evidence or Video Conferencing - MT]
  • February 28, 2022: [Proposed Findings of Fact]
  • February 28, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 28, 2022: [Proposed Pretrial Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order]
  • February 09, 2022: [Remark]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 07, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • February 07, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 07, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Stipulated Motion - MT]
  • January 13, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 13, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • January 12, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
  • January 12, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 12, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • January 12, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order]
  • January 07, 2022: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • January 05, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 03, 2022: [Response to Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • December 17, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 17, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • December 17, 2021: [Proof of Service - MT]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order]
  • December 08, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 07, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • December 07, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.