U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:13-cr-00092-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 03, 2022: [Dismiss ]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • December 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • December 30, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 29, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 21, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • December 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 20, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 20, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • December 20, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • December 20, 2021: [1 - Interpreter Used - Use Only with Other Event]
  • December 20, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 15, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 13, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 07, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.