U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00122
  • Case Name: Maclean v. Prudential Insurance Company of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 18, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - MT]
  • April 18, 2022: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • April 18, 2022: [Counterclaim]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • February 28, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • February 28, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • December 14, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 14, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 14, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • December 10, 2021: [Remark]
  • December 10, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • December 10, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 07, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • December 07, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.