U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00124
  • Case Name: Bertelsen v. Dunhop et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 04, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Letter]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Letter]
  • February 22, 2022: [Letter]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • February 16, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 10, 2022: [Letter]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Letter]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement - SDM]
  • December 08, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • December 08, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.