U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00147
  • Case Name: Darling v. Eddy et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 23, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 19, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 19, 2022: [Strike - SDM]
  • August 08, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 04, 2022: [Response to Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 07, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • July 05, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 05, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 01, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 01, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 18, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 18, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • December 08, 2021: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • December 08, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • December 08, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.