U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00130
  • Case Name: Matta v. Yellowstone County Detention Facility et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 11, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • December 30, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 27, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 27, 2022: [Order/Judgment - MT]
  • December 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 21, 2022: [Sanctions]
  • December 16, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 14, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
  • December 07, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • December 05, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 01, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • November 17, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 09, 2022: [Sanctions]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 11, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • September 12, 2022: [Mail Returned]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 29, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • August 22, 2022: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 22, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 11, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • August 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 11, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • August 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 08, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • August 05, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • July 19, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order/Judgment - MT]
  • July 07, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 06, 2022: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order/Judgment - MT]
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 05, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed IFP Case - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 21, 2022: [Affidavit in Support]
  • June 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • June 17, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • June 16, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • June 07, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order to Serve Complaint - MT]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order/Judgment - MT]
  • May 19, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • May 13, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend]
  • May 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to Amend ]
  • May 04, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 02, 2022: [Mail Returned]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 20, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order/Judgment - MT]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 22, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 14, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order/Judgment - MT]
  • March 02, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed IFP Case - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 14, 2022: [Compel]
  • February 09, 2022: [Mail Returned]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order to Serve Complaint - MT]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement - SDM]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order]
  • December 16, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • December 08, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.