U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00100
  • Case Name: Gomez v Shelby Prison CCC et al.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
  • December 29, 2021: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement - SDM]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.