U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00093
  • Case Name: Cottonwood Environmental Law Center et al v. Yellowstone Mountain Club
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 03, 2022: [Response to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Sever]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • September 16, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • June 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Mediation - MT]
  • June 07, 2022: [Telephonic Status Conference]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • May 18, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 18, 2022: [Mediation - MT]
  • May 16, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 03, 2022: [Response to Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • April 19, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 19, 2022: [Sever]
  • April 19, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 24, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 21, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • March 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 14, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 07, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 04, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 04, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction - SDM]
  • March 04, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 04, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order]
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • February 18, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 18, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 10, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • February 10, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • February 10, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 10, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • December 10, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 09, 2021: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • December 09, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • December 09, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.