U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00131
  • Case Name: Wolff v. Knight Transportation, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 04, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 24, 2022: [Telephonic Scheduling Conference]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • May 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 13, 2022: [Settlement Conference - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • February 04, 2022: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • February 01, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • February 01, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 25, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 14, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 13, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • December 10, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 10, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 10, 2021: [Third Party Complaint]
  • December 10, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • December 10, 2021: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.