U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McGraw
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • August 31, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • August 30, 2022: [Letter - MT]
  • August 30, 2022: [1 - Applicable Party Document-use ONLY with other selection]
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 02, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • July 29, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 20, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Transfer of Jurisdiction (Preliminary) - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Transfer of Jurisdiction (Preliminary) - MT]
  • December 14, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.